Changes in Membership
41st Parliament
Refine your search
55 Results
Name | Constituency | Details | Date |
---|---|---|---|
Layton, Hon. Jack | Toronto—Danforth | Deceased — NDP | Monday, August 22, 2011 |
Goldring, Peter | Edmonton East | Change of political affiliation — Conservative to Independent Conservative | Monday, December 5, 2011 |
St-Denis, Lise | Saint-Maurice—Champlain | Change of political affiliation — NDP to Liberal | Tuesday, January 10, 2012 |
Scott, Craig | Toronto—Danforth | Elected at by-election — NDP | Monday, March 19, 2012 |
Hyer, Bruce | Thunder Bay—Superior North | Change of political affiliation — NDP to Independent | Monday, April 23, 2012 |
Richardson, Lee | Calgary Centre | Resigned as Member of Parliament — Conservative | Wednesday, June 6, 2012 |
Oda, Hon. Bev | Durham | Resigned as Member of Parliament — Conservative | Tuesday, July 31, 2012 |
Savoie, Denise | Victoria | Resigned as Member of Parliament — NDP | Friday, August 31, 2012 |
Crockatt, Joan | Calgary Centre | Elected at by-election — Conservative | Monday, November 26, 2012 |
O'Toole, Hon. Erin | Durham | Elected at by-election — Conservative | Monday, November 26, 2012 |
Rankin, Murray | Victoria | Elected at by-election — NDP | Monday, November 26, 2012 |
Patry, Claude | Jonquière—Alma | Change of political affiliation — NDP to Bloc Québécois | Thursday, February 28, 2013 |
Penashue, Hon. Peter | Labrador | Resigned as Member of Parliament — Conservative | Thursday, March 14, 2013 |
Jones, Yvonne | Labrador | Elected at by-election — Liberal | Monday, May 13, 2013 |
Coderre, Hon. Denis | Bourassa | Resigned as Member of Parliament — Liberal | Sunday, June 2, 2013 |
Rathgeber, Brent | Edmonton—St. Albert | Change of political affiliation — Conservative to Independent | Thursday, June 6, 2013 |
Goldring, Peter | Edmonton East | Change of political affiliation — Independent Conservative to Conservative | Monday, June 10, 2013 |
Toews, Hon. Vic | Provencher | Resigned as Member of Parliament — Conservative | Tuesday, July 9, 2013 |
Rae, Hon. Bob | Toronto Centre | Resigned as Member of Parliament — Liberal | Wednesday, July 31, 2013 |
Tweed, Merv | Brandon—Souris | Resigned as Member of Parliament — Conservative | Saturday, August 31, 2013 |
Mourani, Maria | Ahuntsic | Change of political affiliation — Bloc Québécois to Independent | Wednesday, September 18, 2013 |
Del Mastro, Dean | Peterborough | Change of political affiliation — Conservative to Conservative Independent | Monday, September 30, 2013 |
Menzies, Hon. Ted | Macleod | Resigned as Member of Parliament — Conservative | Saturday, November 9, 2013 |
Falk, Ted | Provencher | Elected at by-election — Conservative | Monday, November 25, 2013 |
Maguire, Larry | Brandon—Souris | Elected at by-election — Conservative | Monday, November 25, 2013 |
Dubourg, Emmanuel | Bourassa | Elected at by-election — Liberal | Monday, November 25, 2013 |
Freeland, Hon. Chrystia | Toronto Centre | Elected at by-election — Liberal | Monday, November 25, 2013 |
Hyer, Bruce | Thunder Bay—Superior North | Change of political affiliation — Independent to Green Party | Friday, December 13, 2013 |
Jean, Brian | Fort McMurray—Athabasca | Resigned as Member of Parliament — Conservative | Friday, January 17, 2014 |
Chow, Olivia | Trinity—Spadina | Resigned as Member of Parliament — NDP | Wednesday, March 12, 2014 |
Karygiannis, Hon. Jim | Scarborough—Agincourt | Resigned as Member of Parliament — Liberal | Tuesday, April 1, 2014 |
Flaherty, Hon. Jim | Whitby—Oshawa | Deceased — Conservative | Thursday, April 10, 2014 |
Perreault, Manon | Montcalm | Change of political affiliation — NDP to Independent | Friday, June 6, 2014 |
Barlow, John | Macleod | Elected at by-election — Conservative | Monday, June 30, 2014 |
Yurdiga, David | Fort McMurray—Athabasca | Elected at by-election — Conservative | Monday, June 30, 2014 |
Chan, Arnold | Scarborough—Agincourt | Elected at by-election — Liberal | Monday, June 30, 2014 |
Vaughan, Adam | Trinity—Spadina | Elected at by-election — Liberal | Monday, June 30, 2014 |
Fortin, Jean-François | Haute-Gaspésie—La Mitis—Matane—Matapédia | Change of political affiliation — Bloc Québécois to Independent | Tuesday, August 12, 2014 |
Hassainia, Sana | Verchères—Les Patriotes | Change of political affiliation — NDP to Independent | Wednesday, August 20, 2014 |
Bellavance, André | Richmond—Arthabaska | Change of political affiliation — Bloc Québecois to Independent | Monday, August 25, 2014 |
Merrifield, Hon. Rob | Yellowhead | Resigned as Member of Parliament — Conservative | Wednesday, September 17, 2014 |
Fortin, Jean-François | Haute-Gaspésie—La Mitis—Matane—Matapédia | Change of political affiliation — Independent to Forces et Démocratie | Tuesday, October 21, 2014 |
Larose, Jean-François | Repentigny | Change of political affiliation — NDP to Forces et Démocratie | Tuesday, October 21, 2014 |
Andrews, Scott | Avalon | Change of political affiliation — Liberal to Independent | Wednesday, November 5, 2014 |
Pacetti, Massimo | Saint-Léonard—Saint-Michel | Change of political affiliation — Liberal to Independent | Wednesday, November 5, 2014 |
Del Mastro, Dean | Peterborough | Resigned as Member of Parliament — Conservative Independent | Wednesday, November 5, 2014 |
Eglinski, Jim | Yellowhead | Elected at by-election — Conservative | Monday, November 17, 2014 |
Perkins, Pat | Whitby—Oshawa | Elected at by-election — Conservative | Monday, November 17, 2014 |
Thibeault, Glenn | Sudbury | Change of political affiliation — NDP to Independent | Monday, January 5, 2015 |
Thibeault, Glenn | Sudbury | Resigned as Member of Parliament — Independent | Monday, January 5, 2015 |
Adams, Eve | Mississauga—Brampton South | Change of political affiliation — CPC to Liberal | Monday, February 9, 2015 |
Baird, Hon. John | Ottawa West—Nepean | Resigned as Member of Parliament — Conservative | Monday, March 16, 2015 |
Lunney, James | Nanaimo—Alberni | Change of political affiliation — CPC to Independent | Tuesday, March 31, 2015 |
Brown, Patrick | Barrie | Resigned as Member of Parliament — Conservative | Thursday, May 14, 2015 |
Nunez-Melo, José | Laval | Change of political affiliation — NDP to Independent | Sunday, August 2, 2015 |
Information on changes in membership is available beginning with the 36th Parliament.
Additional historical information
may be available in PARLINFO.
Last Modified: Thursday, September 19, 2024