Roles - Hon. Sergio Marchi
Current and Past
Member of Parliament
Constituency | Province / Territory | Start Date | End Date |
---|---|---|---|
York West | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Tuesday, August 3, 1999 |
Offices and Roles as a Parliamentarian
Parliament | Office or Role | Start Date | End Date |
---|---|---|---|
36th | Minister for International Trade | Wednesday, June 11, 1997 | Monday, August 2, 1999 |
Election Candidate
Date | Election Type | Constituency | Province / Territory | Result |
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, June 2, 1997 | General Election | York West | Ontario | Re-Elected |