Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 10 of 10
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arseneault, René | Liberal | Madawaska—Restigouche | New Brunswick | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Cormier, Serge | Liberal | Acadie—Bathurst | New Brunswick | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
DeCourcey, Matt | Liberal | Fredericton | New Brunswick | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Finnigan, Pat | Liberal | Miramichi—Grand Lake | New Brunswick | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Harvey, T.J. | Liberal | Tobique—Mactaquac | New Brunswick | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
LeBlanc, Hon. Dominic | Liberal | Beauséjour | New Brunswick | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Lockhart, Alaina | Liberal | Fundy Royal | New Brunswick | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Long, Wayne | Liberal | Saint John—Rothesay | New Brunswick | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Ludwig, Karen | Liberal | New Brunswick Southwest | New Brunswick | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Petitpas Taylor, Hon. Ginette | Liberal | Moncton—Riverview—Dieppe | New Brunswick | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.