Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 14 of 14
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashton, Niki | NDP | Churchill—Keewatinook Aski | Manitoba | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Bergen, Hon. Candice | Conservative | Portage—Lisgar | Manitoba | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Bezan, James | Conservative | Selkirk—Interlake—Eastman | Manitoba | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Blaikie, Daniel | NDP | Elmwood—Transcona | Manitoba | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Carr, Hon. Jim | Liberal | Winnipeg South Centre | Manitoba | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Duguid, Terry | Liberal | Winnipeg South | Manitoba | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Eyolfson, Doug | Liberal | Charleswood—St. James—Assiniboia—Headingley | Manitoba | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Falk, Ted | Conservative | Provencher | Manitoba | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Lamoureux, Kevin | Liberal | Winnipeg North | Manitoba | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Maguire, Larry | Conservative | Brandon—Souris | Manitoba | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Mihychuk, Hon. MaryAnn | Liberal | Kildonan—St. Paul | Manitoba | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Ouellette, Robert-Falcon | Liberal | Winnipeg Centre | Manitoba | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Sopuck, Robert | Conservative | Dauphin—Swan River—Neepawa | Manitoba | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Vandal, Dan | Liberal | Saint Boniface—Saint Vital | Manitoba | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.