Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 10 of 10
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Allen, Mike | Conservative | Tobique—Mactaquac | New Brunswick | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Ashfield, Hon. Keith | Conservative | Fredericton | New Brunswick | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Godin, Yvon | NDP | Acadie—Bathurst | New Brunswick | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Goguen, Robert | Conservative | Moncton—Riverview—Dieppe | New Brunswick | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
LeBlanc, Hon. Dominic | Liberal | Beauséjour | New Brunswick | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Moore, Hon. Rob | Conservative | Fundy Royal | New Brunswick | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
O'Neill Gordon, Tilly | Conservative | Miramichi | New Brunswick | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Valcourt, Hon. Bernard | Conservative | Madawaska—Restigouche | New Brunswick | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Weston, Rodney | Conservative | Saint John | New Brunswick | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Williamson, John | Conservative | New Brunswick Southwest | New Brunswick | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.