Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 16 of 16
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashton, Niki | NDP | Churchill | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Bateman, Joyce | Conservative | Winnipeg South Centre | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Bergen, Hon. Candice | Conservative | Portage—Lisgar | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Bezan, James | Conservative | Selkirk—Interlake | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Bruinooge, Rod | Conservative | Winnipeg South | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Falk, Ted | Conservative | Provencher | Manitoba | Monday, November 25, 2013 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Fletcher, Hon. Steven | Conservative | Charleswood—St. James—Assiniboia | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Glover, Hon. Shelly | Conservative | Saint Boniface | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Lamoureux, Kevin | Liberal | Winnipeg North | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Maguire, Larry | Conservative | Brandon—Souris | Manitoba | Monday, November 25, 2013 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Martin, Pat | NDP | Winnipeg Centre | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Smith, Joy | Conservative | Kildonan—St. Paul | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Sopuck, Robert | Conservative | Dauphin—Swan River—Marquette | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Toet, Lawrence | Conservative | Elmwood—Transcona | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Toews, Hon. Vic | Conservative | Provencher | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Tuesday, July 9, 2013 |
Tweed, Merv | Conservative | Brandon—Souris | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Saturday, August 31, 2013 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.