Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 32 of 32
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ablonczy, Hon. Diane | Conservative | Calgary—Nose Hill | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Ambrose, Hon. Rona | Conservative | Edmonton—Spruce Grove | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Anders, Rob | Conservative | Calgary West | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Barlow, John | Conservative | Macleod | Alberta | Monday, June 30, 2014 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Benoit, Leon | Conservative | Vegreville—Wainwright | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Calkins, Blaine | Conservative | Wetaskiwin | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Crockatt, Joan | Conservative | Calgary Centre | Alberta | Monday, November 26, 2012 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Dreeshen, Earl | Conservative | Red Deer | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Duncan, Linda | NDP | Edmonton—Strathcona | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Eglinski, Jim | Conservative | Yellowhead | Alberta | Monday, November 17, 2014 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Goldring, Peter | Conservative | Edmonton East | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Harper, Right Hon. Stephen | Conservative | Calgary Southwest | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Hawn, Hon. Laurie | Conservative | Edmonton Centre | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Hillyer, Jim | Conservative | Lethbridge | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Jean, Brian | Conservative | Fort McMurray—Athabasca | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Friday, January 17, 2014 |
Kenney, Hon. Jason | Conservative | Calgary Southeast | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Lake, Hon. Mike | Conservative | Edmonton—Mill Woods—Beaumont | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Menzies, Hon. Ted | Conservative | Macleod | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Saturday, November 9, 2013 |
Merrifield, Hon. Rob | Conservative | Yellowhead | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Wednesday, September 17, 2014 |
Obhrai, Hon. Deepak | Conservative | Calgary East | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Payne, LaVar | Conservative | Medicine Hat | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Rajotte, James | Conservative | Edmonton—Leduc | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Rathgeber, Brent | Independent | Edmonton—St. Albert | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Rempel, Hon. Michelle | Conservative | Calgary Centre-North | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Richards, Blake | Conservative | Wild Rose | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Richardson, Lee | Conservative | Calgary Centre | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Wednesday, June 6, 2012 |
Shory, Devinder | Conservative | Calgary Northeast | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Sorenson, Hon. Kevin | Conservative | Crowfoot | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Storseth, Brian | Conservative | Westlock—St. Paul | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Uppal, Hon. Tim | Conservative | Edmonton—Sherwood Park | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Warkentin, Chris | Conservative | Peace River | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Yurdiga, David | Conservative | Fort McMurray—Athabasca | Alberta | Monday, June 30, 2014 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.