Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 7 of 7
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrews, Scott | Liberal | Avalon | Newfoundland and Labrador | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Byrne, Hon. Gerry | Liberal | Humber—St. Barbe—Baie Verte | Newfoundland and Labrador | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Coady, Siobhan | Liberal | St. John's South—Mount Pearl | Newfoundland and Labrador | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Foote, Hon. Judy | Liberal | Random—Burin—St. George's | Newfoundland and Labrador | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Harris, Jack | NDP | St. John's East | Newfoundland and Labrador | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Russell, Todd Norman | Liberal | Labrador | Newfoundland and Labrador | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Simms, Scott | Liberal | Bonavista—Gander—Grand Falls—Windsor | Newfoundland and Labrador | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.