Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 10 of 10
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Allen, Mike | Conservative | Tobique—Mactaquac | New Brunswick | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Ashfield, Hon. Keith | Conservative | Fredericton | New Brunswick | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
D'Amours, Jean-Claude | Liberal | Madawaska—Restigouche | New Brunswick | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Godin, Yvon | NDP | Acadie—Bathurst | New Brunswick | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
LeBlanc, Hon. Dominic | Liberal | Beauséjour | New Brunswick | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Moore, Hon. Rob | Conservative | Fundy Royal | New Brunswick | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Murphy, Brian | Liberal | Moncton—Riverview—Dieppe | New Brunswick | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
O'Neill Gordon, Tilly | Conservative | Miramichi | New Brunswick | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Thompson, Hon. Greg Francis | Conservative | New Brunswick Southwest | New Brunswick | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Weston, Rodney | Conservative | Saint John | New Brunswick | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.