Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Easter, Hon. Wayne | Liberal | Malpeque | Prince Edward Island | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
MacAulay, Hon. Lawrence | Liberal | Cardigan | Prince Edward Island | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
McGuire, Hon. Joe | Liberal | Egmont | Prince Edward Island | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Murphy, Hon. Shawn | Liberal | Charlottetown | Prince Edward Island | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.