Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 14 of 14
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alcock, Hon. Reg | Liberal | Winnipeg South | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Bezan, James | Conservative | Selkirk—Interlake | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Blaikie, Hon. Bill | NDP | Elmwood—Transcona | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Desjarlais, Bev | Independent | Churchill | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Fletcher, Hon. Steven | Conservative | Charleswood—St. James—Assiniboia | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Mark, Inky | Conservative | Dauphin—Swan River—Marquette | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Martin, Pat | NDP | Winnipeg Centre | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Neville, Hon. Anita | Liberal | Winnipeg South Centre | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Pallister, Brian | Conservative | Portage—Lisgar | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Simard, Hon. Raymond | Liberal | Saint Boniface | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Smith, Joy | Conservative | Kildonan—St. Paul | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Toews, Hon. Vic | Conservative | Provencher | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Tweed, Merv | Conservative | Brandon—Souris | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Wasylycia-Leis, Judy | NDP | Winnipeg North | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.