Members of the 37th Parliament
(Monday, January 29, 2001 to Sunday, May 23, 2004)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 15 of 15
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alcock, Hon. Reg | Liberal | Winnipeg South | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Blaikie, Hon. Bill | NDP | Winnipeg—Transcona | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Borotsik, Rick | Conservative | Brandon—Souris | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Desjarlais, Bev | NDP | Churchill | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Duhamel, Hon. Ronald | Liberal | Saint Boniface | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Monday, January 14, 2002 |
Harvard, Hon. John | Liberal | Charleswood St. James—Assiniboia | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Thursday, May 6, 2004 |
Hilstrom, Howard | Conservative | Selkirk—Interlake | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Mark, Inky | Conservative | Dauphin—Swan River | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Martin, Pat | NDP | Winnipeg Centre | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Neville, Hon. Anita | Liberal | Winnipeg South Centre | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Pagtakhan, Hon. Rey | Liberal | Winnipeg North—St. Paul | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Pallister, Brian | Conservative | Portage—Lisgar | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Simard, Hon. Raymond | Liberal | Saint Boniface | Manitoba | Monday, May 13, 2002 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Toews, Hon. Vic | Conservative | Provencher | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Wasylycia-Leis, Judy | NDP | Winnipeg North Centre | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.