Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 78 of 78
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alarie, Hélène | Bloc Québécois | Louis-Hébert | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Assad, Mark | Liberal | Gatineau | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Asselin, Gérard | Bloc Québécois | Charlevoix | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bachand, André | PC | Richmond—Arthabaska | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bachand, Claude | Bloc Québécois | Saint-Jean | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bakopanos, Hon. Eleni | Liberal | Ahuntsic | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bellehumeur, Michel | Bloc Québécois | Berthier—Montcalm | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bergeron, Stéphane | Bloc Québécois | Verchères—Les-Patriotes | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bernier, Yvan | Bloc Québécois | Bonaventure—Gaspé—Îles-de-la-Madeleine—Pabok | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bertrand, Robert | Liberal | Pontiac—Gatineau—Labelle | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bigras, Bernard | Bloc Québécois | Rosemont—Petite-Patrie | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Brien, Pierre | Bloc Québécois | Témiscamingue | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Canuel, René | Bloc Québécois | Matapédia—Matane | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Cardin, Serge | Bloc Québécois | Sherbrooke | Quebec | Monday, September 14, 1998 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Cauchon, Hon. Martin | Liberal | Outremont | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Charbonneau, Hon. Yvon | Liberal | Anjou—Rivière-des-Prairies | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Charest, Hon. Jean J. | PC | Sherbrooke | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Friday, May 1, 1998 |
Chrétien, Right Hon. Jean | Liberal | Saint-Maurice | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Chrétien, Jean-Guy | Bloc Québécois | Frontenac—Mégantic | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Coderre, Hon. Denis | Liberal | Bourassa | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Cotler, Hon. Irwin | Liberal | Mount Royal | Quebec | Monday, November 15, 1999 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Crête, Paul | Bloc Québécois | Kamouraska—Rivière-du-Loup—Témiscouata—Les Basques | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Dalphond-Guiral, Madeleine | Bloc Québécois | Laval Centre | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
de Savoye, Pierre | Bloc Québécois | Portneuf | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Debien, Maud | Bloc Québécois | Laval East | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Desrochers, Odina | Bloc Québécois | Lotbinière—L'Érable | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Dion, Hon. Stéphane | Liberal | Saint-Laurent—Cartierville | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Discepola, Nick | Liberal | Vaudreuil—Soulanges | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Drouin, Claude | Liberal | Beauce | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Dubé, Antoine | Bloc Québécois | Lévis-et-Chutes-de-la-Chaudière | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Duceppe, Gilles | Bloc Québécois | Laurier—Sainte-Marie | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Dumas, Maurice | Bloc Québécois | Argenteuil—Papineau—Mirabel | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Finestone, Hon. Sheila | Liberal | Mount Royal | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Tuesday, August 10, 1999 |
Folco, Raymonde | Liberal | Laval West | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Fournier, Ghislain | Bloc Québécois | Manicouagan | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Gagliano, Hon. Alfonso L. | Liberal | Saint-Léonard—Saint-Michel | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Gagnon, Christiane | Bloc Québécois | Québec | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Gauthier, Michel | Bloc Québécois | Roberval | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Girard-Bujold, Jocelyne | Bloc Québécois | Jonquière | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Godin, Maurice | Bloc Québécois | Châteauguay | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Guay, Monique | Bloc Québécois | Laurentides | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Guimond, Michel | Bloc Québécois | Beauport—Montmorency—Côte-de-Beaupré—Île-d'Orléans | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Harvey, Hon. André | Liberal | Chicoutimi—Le Fjord | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Jennings, Hon. Marlene | Liberal | Notre-Dame-de-Grâce—Lachine | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Lalonde, Francine | Bloc Québécois | Mercier | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Laurin, René | Bloc Québécois | Joliette | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Lavigne, Hon. Raymond | Liberal | Verdun—Saint-Henri—Saint-Paul—Pointe Saint-Charles | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Lebel, Ghislain | Bloc Québécois | Chambly | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Lefebvre, Réjean | Independent | Champlain | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Lincoln, Clifford | Liberal | Lac-Saint-Louis | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Loubier, Yvan | Bloc Québécois | Saint-Hyacinthe—Bagot | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Marceau, Richard | Bloc Québécois | Charlesbourg—Jacques-Cartier | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Marchand, Jean-Paul | Bloc Québécois | Québec Est | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Martin, Right Hon. Paul | Liberal | LaSalle—Émard | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Massé, Hon. Marcel | Liberal | Hull—Aylmer | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Friday, September 10, 1999 |
Ménard, Réal | Bloc Québécois | Hochelaga—Maisonneuve | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Mercier, Paul | Bloc Québécois | Terrebonne—Blainville | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Normand, Hon. Gilbert | Liberal | Bellechasse—Etchemins—Montmagny—L'Islet | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Paradis, Hon. Denis | Liberal | Brome—Missisquoi | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Patry, Bernard | Liberal | Pierrefonds—Dollard | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Perron, Gilles-A. | Bloc Québécois | Rivière-des-Mille-Îles | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Pettigrew, Hon. Pierre | Liberal | Papineau—Saint-Denis | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Picard, Pauline | Bloc Québécois | Drummond | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Plamondon, Louis | Bloc Québécois | Bas-Richelieu—Nicolet—Bécancour | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Price, Hon. David | Liberal | Compton—Stanstead | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Proulx, Marcel | Liberal | Hull—Aylmer | Quebec | Monday, November 15, 1999 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Robillard, Hon. Lucienne | Liberal | Westmount—Ville-Marie | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Rocheleau, Yves | Bloc Québécois | Trois-Rivières | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Saada, Hon. Jacques | Liberal | Brossard—La Prairie | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Sauvageau, Benoît | Bloc Québécois | Repentigny | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
St-Hilaire, Caroline | Bloc Québécois | Longueuil | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
St-Jacques, Diane | Liberal | Shefford | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
St-Julien, Guy | Liberal | Abitibi—Baie-James—Nunavik | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Thibeault, Yolande | Liberal | Saint-Lambert | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Tremblay, Stéphan | Bloc Québécois | Lac-Saint-Jean—Saguenay | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Tremblay, Suzanne | Bloc Québécois | Rimouski-Neigette-et-la Mitis | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Turp, Daniel | Bloc Québécois | Beauharnois—Salaberry | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Venne, Pierrette | Bloc Québécois | Saint-Bruno—Saint-Hubert | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.