Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 10 of 10
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wallace, Mike | Conservative | Burlington | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Warawa, Mark | Conservative | Langley | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Warkentin, Chris | Conservative | Peace River | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Watson, Jeff | Conservative | Essex | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Weston, John | Conservative | West Vancouver—Sunshine Coast—Sea to Sky Country | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Weston, Rodney | Conservative | Saint John | New Brunswick | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Wilks, David | Conservative | Kootenay—Columbia | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Williamson, John | Conservative | New Brunswick Southwest | New Brunswick | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Wong, Hon. Alice | Conservative | Richmond | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Woodworth, Stephen | Conservative | Kitchener Centre | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.