Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 11 of 11
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wallace, Mike | Conservative | Burlington | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Warawa, Mark | Conservative | Langley | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Warkentin, Chris | Conservative | Peace River | Alberta | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Wasylycia-Leis, Judy | NDP | Winnipeg North | Manitoba | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Friday, April 30, 2010 |
Watson, Jeff | Conservative | Essex | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Weston, John | Conservative | West Vancouver—Sunshine Coast—Sea to Sky Country | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Weston, Rodney | Conservative | Saint John | New Brunswick | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Wilfert, Hon. Bryon | Liberal | Richmond Hill | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Wong, Hon. Alice | Conservative | Richmond | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Woodworth, Stephen | Conservative | Kitchener Centre | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Wrzesnewskyj, Borys | Liberal | Etobicoke Centre | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.