Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 9 of 9
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wappel, Tom | Liberal | Scarborough Southwest | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Wasylycia-Leis, Judy | NDP | Winnipeg North Centre | Manitoba | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Wayne, Elsie | PC | Saint John | New Brunswick | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Whelan, Susan | Liberal | Essex | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
White, Randy | Canadian Alliance | Langley—Abbotsford | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
White, Ted | Canadian Alliance | North Vancouver | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Wilfert, Hon. Bryon | Liberal | Oak Ridges | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Williams, John G. | Canadian Alliance | St. Albert | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Wood, Bob | Liberal | Nipissing | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.