Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 6 of 6
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valcourt, Hon. Bernard | Conservative | Madawaska—Restigouche | New Brunswick | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Valeriote, Frank | Liberal | Guelph | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Van Kesteren, Dave | Conservative | Chatham-Kent—Essex | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Van Loan, Hon. Peter | Conservative | York—Simcoe | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Vaughan, Adam | Liberal | Trinity—Spadina | Ontario | Monday, June 30, 2014 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Vellacott, Maurice | Conservative | Saskatoon—Wanuskewin | Saskatchewan | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.