Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 7 of 7
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valley, Roger | Liberal | Kenora | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Van Kesteren, Dave | Conservative | Chatham-Kent—Essex | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Van Loan, Hon. Peter | Conservative | York—Simcoe | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Vellacott, Maurice | Conservative | Saskatoon—Wanuskewin | Saskatchewan | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Verner, Hon. Josée | Conservative | Louis-Saint-Laurent | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Vincent, Robert | Bloc Québécois | Shefford | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Volpe, Hon. Joseph | Liberal | Eglinton—Lawrence | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.