Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 6 of 6
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valeri, Hon. Tony | Liberal | Hamilton East—Stoney Creek | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Valley, Roger | Liberal | Kenora | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Van Loan, Hon. Peter | Conservative | York—Simcoe | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Vellacott, Maurice | Conservative | Saskatoon—Wanuskewin | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Vincent, Robert | Bloc Québécois | Shefford | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Volpe, Hon. Joseph | Liberal | Eglinton—Lawrence | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.