Members of the 37th Parliament
(Monday, January 29, 2001 to Sunday, May 23, 2004)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valeri, Hon. Tony | Liberal | Stoney Creek | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Vanclief, Hon. Lyle | Liberal | Prince Edward—Hastings | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Vellacott, Maurice | Conservative | Saskatoon—Wanuskewin | Saskatchewan | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Venne, Pierrette | Independent Bloc Québécois | Saint-Bruno—Saint-Hubert | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Volpe, Hon. Joseph | Liberal | Eglinton—Lawrence | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.