Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 13 of 13
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Telegdi, Hon. Andrew | Liberal | Kitchener—Waterloo | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Temelkovski, Lui | Liberal | Oak Ridges—Markham | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Thi Lac, Ève-Mary Thaï | Bloc Québécois | Saint-Hyacinthe—Bagot | Quebec | Monday, September 17, 2007 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Thibault, Louise | Independent | Rimouski-Neigette—Témiscouata—Les Basques | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Thibault, Hon. Robert | Liberal | West Nova | Nova Scotia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Thompson, Hon. Greg Francis | Conservative | New Brunswick Southwest | New Brunswick | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Thompson, Myron | Conservative | Wild Rose | Alberta | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Tilson, David | Conservative | Dufferin—Caledon | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Toews, Hon. Vic | Conservative | Provencher | Manitoba | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Tonks, Alan | Liberal | York South—Weston | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Trost, Brad | Conservative | Saskatoon—Humboldt | Saskatchewan | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Turner, Hon. Garth | Liberal | Halton | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Tweed, Merv | Conservative | Brandon—Souris | Manitoba | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.