Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 12 of 12
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Telegdi, Hon. Andrew | Liberal | Kitchener—Waterloo | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Temelkovski, Lui | Liberal | Oak Ridges—Markham | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Thibault, Louise | Bloc Québécois | Rimouski-Neigette—Témiscouata—Les Basques | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Thibault, Hon. Robert | Liberal | West Nova | Nova Scotia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Thompson, Hon. Greg Francis | Conservative | New Brunswick Southwest | New Brunswick | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Thompson, Myron | Conservative | Wild Rose | Alberta | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Tilson, David | Conservative | Dufferin—Caledon | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Toews, Hon. Vic | Conservative | Provencher | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Tonks, Alan | Liberal | York South—Weston | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Torsney, Hon. Paddy | Liberal | Burlington | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Trost, Brad | Conservative | Saskatoon—Humboldt | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Tweed, Merv | Conservative | Brandon—Souris | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.