Members of the 37th Parliament
(Monday, January 29, 2001 to Sunday, May 23, 2004)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 13 of 13
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rajotte, James | Conservative | Edmonton Southwest | Alberta | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Redman, Hon. Karen | Liberal | Kitchener Centre | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Reed, Julian | Liberal | Halton | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Regan, Hon. Geoff | Liberal | Halifax West | Nova Scotia | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Reid, Scott | Conservative | Lanark—Carleton | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Reynolds, Hon. John | Conservative | West Vancouver—Sunshine Coast | British Columbia | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Richardson, John | Liberal | Perth—Middlesex | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Friday, October 11, 2002 |
Ritz, Hon. Gerry | Conservative | Battlefords—Lloydminster | Saskatchewan | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Robillard, Hon. Lucienne | Liberal | Westmount—Ville-Marie | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Robinson, Svend | NDP | Burnaby—Douglas | British Columbia | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Rocheleau, Yves | Bloc Québécois | Trois-Rivières | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Rock, Hon. Allan | Liberal | Etobicoke Centre | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Friday, December 12, 2003 |
Roy, Jean-Yves | Bloc Québécois | Matapédia—Matane | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.