Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 11 of 11
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ramsay, Jack | Ind. CA | Crowfoot | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Redman, Hon. Karen | Liberal | Kitchener Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Reed, Julian | Liberal | Halton | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Reynolds, Hon. John | Canadian Alliance | West Vancouver—Sunshine Coast | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Richardson, John | Liberal | Perth—Middlesex | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Riis, Nelson | NDP | Kamloops, Thompson and Highland Valleys | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Ritz, Hon. Gerry | Canadian Alliance | Battlefords—Lloydminster | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Robillard, Hon. Lucienne | Liberal | Westmount—Ville-Marie | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Robinson, Svend | NDP | Burnaby—Douglas | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Rocheleau, Yves | Bloc Québécois | Trois-Rivières | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Rock, Hon. Allan | Liberal | Etobicoke Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.