Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 13 of 13
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pacetti, Massimo | Independent | Saint-Léonard—Saint-Michel | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Papillon, Annick | NDP | Québec | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Paradis, Hon. Christian | Conservative | Mégantic—L'Érable | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Patry, Claude | Bloc Québécois | Jonquière—Alma | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Payne, LaVar | Conservative | Medicine Hat | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Péclet, Ève | NDP | La Pointe-de-l'Île | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Penashue, Hon. Peter | Conservative | Labrador | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Thursday, March 14, 2013 |
Perkins, Pat | Conservative | Whitby—Oshawa | Ontario | Monday, November 17, 2014 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Perreault, Manon | Independent | Montcalm | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Pilon, François | NDP | Laval—Les Îles | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Plamondon, Louis | Bloc Québécois | Bas-Richelieu—Nicolet—Bécancour | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Poilievre, Hon. Pierre | Conservative | Nepean—Carleton | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Preston, Joe | Conservative | Elgin—Middlesex—London | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.