Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 15 of 15
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pacetti, Massimo | Liberal | Saint-Léonard—Saint-Michel | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Paillé, Daniel | Bloc Québécois | Hochelaga | Quebec | Monday, November 9, 2009 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Paillé, Pascal-Pierre | Bloc Québécois | Louis-Hébert | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Paquette, Pierre A. | Bloc Québécois | Joliette | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Paradis, Hon. Christian | Conservative | Mégantic—L'Érable | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Patry, Bernard | Liberal | Pierrefonds—Dollard | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Payne, LaVar | Conservative | Medicine Hat | Alberta | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Pearson, Glen Douglas | Liberal | London North Centre | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Petit, Daniel | Conservative | Charlesbourg—Haute-Saint-Charles | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Plamondon, Louis | Bloc Québécois | Bas-Richelieu—Nicolet—Bécancour | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Poilievre, Pierre | Conservative | Nepean—Carleton | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Pomerleau, Roger | Bloc Québécois | Drummond | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Prentice, Hon. Jim | Conservative | Calgary Centre-North | Alberta | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, November 14, 2010 |
Preston, Joe | Conservative | Elgin—Middlesex—London | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Proulx, Marcel | Liberal | Hull—Aylmer | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.