Members of the 37th Parliament
(Monday, January 29, 2001 to Sunday, May 23, 2004)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 24 of 24
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pacetti, Massimo | Liberal | Saint-Léonard—Saint-Michel | Quebec | Monday, May 13, 2002 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Pagtakhan, Hon. Rey | Liberal | Winnipeg North—St. Paul | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Pallister, Brian | Conservative | Portage—Lisgar | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Pankiw, Jim | Independent | Saskatoon—Humboldt | Saskatchewan | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Paquette, Pierre A. | Bloc Québécois | Joliette | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Paradis, Hon. Denis | Liberal | Brome—Missisquoi | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Parrish, Carolyn | Liberal | Mississauga Centre | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Patry, Bernard | Liberal | Pierrefonds—Dollard | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Penson, Charlie | Conservative | Peace River | Alberta | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Peric, Janko | Liberal | Cambridge | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Perron, Gilles-A. | Bloc Québécois | Rivière-des-Mille-Îles | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Peschisolido, Joe | Liberal | Richmond | British Columbia | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Peterson, Hon. Jim | Liberal | Willowdale | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Pettigrew, Hon. Pierre | Liberal | Papineau—Saint-Denis | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Phinney, Beth | Liberal | Hamilton Mountain | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Picard, Pauline | Bloc Québécois | Drummond | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Pickard, Hon. Jerry | Liberal | Chatham—Kent Essex | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Pillitteri, Gary | Liberal | Niagara Falls | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Plamondon, Louis | Bloc Québécois | Bas-Richelieu—Nicolet—Bécancour | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Pratt, Hon. David | Liberal | Nepean—Carleton | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Price, Hon. David | Liberal | Compton—Stanstead | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Proctor, Dick | NDP | Palliser | Saskatchewan | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Proulx, Marcel | Liberal | Hull—Aylmer | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Provenzano, Carmen | Liberal | Sault Ste. Marie | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.