Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 7 of 7
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
O'Connell, Jennifer | Liberal | Pickering—Uxbridge | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
O'Regan, Hon. Seamus | Liberal | St. John's South—Mount Pearl | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
O'Toole, Hon. Erin | Conservative | Durham | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Obhrai, Hon. Deepak | Conservative | Calgary Forest Lawn | Alberta | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Friday, August 2, 2019 |
Oliphant, Robert | Liberal | Don Valley West | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Oliver, John | Liberal | Oakville | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Ouellette, Robert-Falcon | Liberal | Winnipeg Centre | Manitoba | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.