Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 7 of 7
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
O'Connor, Hon. Gordon | Conservative | Carleton—Mississippi Mills | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
O'Neill Gordon, Tilly | Conservative | Miramichi | New Brunswick | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
O'Toole, Hon. Erin | Conservative | Durham | Ontario | Monday, November 26, 2012 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Obhrai, Hon. Deepak | Conservative | Calgary East | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Oda, Hon. Bev | Conservative | Durham | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Tuesday, July 31, 2012 |
Oliver, Hon. Joe | Conservative | Eglinton—Lawrence | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Opitz, Ted | Conservative | Etobicoke Centre | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.