Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 6 of 6
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nantel, Pierre | NDP | Longueuil—Pierre-Boucher | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Nash, Peggy | NDP | Parkdale—High Park | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Nicholls, Jamie | NDP | Vaudreuil-Soulanges | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Nicholson, Hon. Rob | Conservative | Niagara Falls | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Norlock, Rick | Conservative | Northumberland—Quinte West | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Nunez-Melo, José | Independent | Laval | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.