Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nadeau, Richard | Bloc Québécois | Gatineau | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Neville, Hon. Anita | Liberal | Winnipeg South Centre | Manitoba | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Nicholson, Hon. Rob | Conservative | Niagara Falls | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Norlock, Rick | Conservative | Northumberland—Quinte West | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.