Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nadeau, Richard | Bloc Québécois | Gatineau | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Nash, Peggy | NDP | Parkdale—High Park | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Neville, Hon. Anita | Liberal | Winnipeg South Centre | Manitoba | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Nicholson, Hon. Rob | Conservative | Niagara Falls | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Norlock, Rick | Conservative | Northumberland—Quinte West | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.