Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nault, Hon. Robert D. | Liberal | Kenora—Rainy River | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Normand, Hon. Gilbert | Liberal | Bellechasse—Etchemins—Montmagny—L'Islet | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Nunziata, John | Independent | York South—Weston | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Nystrom, Hon. Lorne | NDP | Regina—Qu'Appelle | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.