Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 41 of 41
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
MacAulay, Hon. Lawrence | Liberal | Cardigan | Prince Edward Island | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
MacKay, Hon. Peter Gordon | PC | Pictou—Antigonish—Guysborough | Nova Scotia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Mahoney, Hon. Steve | Liberal | Mississauga West | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Malhi, Hon. Gurbax S. | Liberal | Bramalea—Gore—Malton—Springdale | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Maloney, John | Liberal | Erie—Lincoln | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Mancini, Peter | NDP | Sydney—Victoria | Nova Scotia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Manley, Hon. John | Liberal | Ottawa South | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Manning, Preston | Canadian Alliance | Calgary Southwest | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Marceau, Richard | Bloc Québécois | Charlesbourg—Jacques-Cartier | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Marchand, Jean-Paul | Bloc Québécois | Québec Est | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Marchi, Hon. Sergio | Liberal | York West | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Tuesday, August 3, 1999 |
Mark, Inky | Canadian Alliance | Dauphin—Swan River | Manitoba | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Marleau, Hon. Diane | Liberal | Sudbury | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Martin, Hon. Keith | Canadian Alliance | Esquimalt—Juan de Fuca | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Martin, Pat | NDP | Winnipeg Centre | Manitoba | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Martin, Right Hon. Paul | Liberal | LaSalle—Émard | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Massé, Hon. Marcel | Liberal | Hull—Aylmer | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Friday, September 10, 1999 |
Matthews, Bill | Liberal | Burin—St. George's | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Mayfield, Philip | Canadian Alliance | Cariboo—Chilcotin | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
McClelland, Ian | Canadian Alliance | Edmonton Southwest | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
McCormick, Larry | Liberal | Hastings—Frontenac—Lennox and Addington | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
McDonough, Alexa | NDP | Halifax | Nova Scotia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
McGuire, Hon. Joe | Liberal | Egmont | Prince Edward Island | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
McKay, Hon. John | Liberal | Scarborough East | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
McLellan, Hon. Anne | Liberal | Edmonton West | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
McNally, Grant | Canadian Alliance | Dewdney—Alouette | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
McTeague, Hon. Dan | Liberal | Pickering—Ajax—Uxbridge | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
McWhinney, Ted | Liberal | Vancouver Quadra | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Ménard, Réal | Bloc Québécois | Hochelaga—Maisonneuve | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Mercier, Paul | Bloc Québécois | Terrebonne—Blainville | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Meredith, Val | Canadian Alliance | South Surrey—White Rock—Langley | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Mifflin, Hon. Fred | Liberal | Bonavista—Trinity—Conception | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Milliken, Hon. Peter | Liberal | Kingston and the Islands | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Mills, Bob | Canadian Alliance | Red Deer | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Mills, Dennis | Liberal | Toronto—Danforth | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Minna, Hon. Maria | Liberal | Beaches—East York | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Mitchell, Hon. Andy | Liberal | Parry Sound—Muskoka | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Morrison, Lee | Canadian Alliance | Cypress Hills—Grasslands | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Muise, Mark | PC | West Nova | Nova Scotia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Murray, Ian | Liberal | Lanark—Carleton | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Myers, Lynn | Liberal | Waterloo—Wellington | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.