Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 21 of 21
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lake, Hon. Mike | Conservative | Edmonton—Mill Woods—Beaumont | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Lamoureux, Kevin | Liberal | Winnipeg North | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Lapointe, François | NDP | Montmagny—L'Islet—Kamouraska—Rivière-du-Loup | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Larose, Jean-François | Repentigny | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 | |
Latendresse, Alexandrine | NDP | Louis-Saint-Laurent | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Lauzon, Guy | Conservative | Stormont—Dundas—South Glengarry | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Laverdière, Hélène | NDP | Laurier—Sainte-Marie | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Layton, Hon. Jack | NDP | Toronto—Danforth | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Monday, August 22, 2011 |
Lebel, Hon. Denis | Conservative | Roberval—Lac-Saint-Jean | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
LeBlanc, Hon. Dominic | Liberal | Beauséjour | New Brunswick | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
LeBlanc, Hélène | NDP | LaSalle—Émard | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Leef, Ryan | Conservative | Yukon | Yukon | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Leitch, Hon. K. Kellie | Conservative | Simcoe—Grey | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Lemieux, Pierre | Conservative | Glengarry—Prescott—Russell | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Leslie, Megan Anissa | NDP | Halifax | Nova Scotia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Leung, Chungsen | Conservative | Willowdale | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Liu, Laurin | NDP | Rivière-des-Mille-Îles | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Lizon, Wladyslaw | Conservative | Mississauga East—Cooksville | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Lobb, Ben | Conservative | Huron—Bruce | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Lukiwski, Tom | Conservative | Regina—Lumsden—Lake Centre | Saskatchewan | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Lunney, James | Independent | Nanaimo—Alberni | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.