Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 9 of 9
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kamp, Randy | Conservative | Pitt Meadows—Maple Ridge—Mission | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Karygiannis, Hon. Jim | Liberal | Scarborough—Agincourt | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Tuesday, April 1, 2014 |
Keddy, Gerald | Conservative | South Shore—St. Margaret's | Nova Scotia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Kellway, Matthew | NDP | Beaches—East York | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Kenney, Hon. Jason | Conservative | Calgary Southeast | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Kent, Hon. Peter | Conservative | Thornhill | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Kerr, Greg | Conservative | West Nova | Nova Scotia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Komarnicki, Ed | Conservative | Souris—Moose Mountain | Saskatchewan | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Kramp, Daryl | Conservative | Prince Edward—Hastings | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.