Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacob, Pierre | NDP | Brome—Missisquoi | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
James, Roxanne | Conservative | Scarborough Centre | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Jean, Brian | Conservative | Fort McMurray—Athabasca | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Friday, January 17, 2014 |
Jones, Yvonne | Liberal | Labrador | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, May 13, 2013 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Julian, Peter | NDP | Burnaby—New Westminster | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.