Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jaffer, Rahim | Conservative | Edmonton—Strathcona | Alberta | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Jean, Brian | Conservative | Fort McMurray—Athabasca | Alberta | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Jennings, Hon. Marlene | Liberal | Notre-Dame-de-Grâce—Lachine | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Johnston, Dale | Conservative | Wetaskiwin | Alberta | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Julian, Peter | NDP | Burnaby—New Westminster | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.