Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 6 of 6
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jackson, Ovid | Liberal | Bruce—Grey—Owen Sound | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Jaffer, Rahim | Canadian Alliance | Edmonton—Strathcona | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Jennings, Hon. Marlene | Liberal | Notre-Dame-de-Grâce—Lachine | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Johnston, Dale | Canadian Alliance | Wetaskiwin | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Jones, Jim | Canadian Alliance | Markham | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Jordan, Hon. Joe | Liberal | Leeds—Grenville | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.