Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 10 of 10
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hanger, Art | Conservative | Calgary Northeast | Alberta | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Harper, Right Hon. Stephen | Conservative | Calgary Southwest | Alberta | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Harris, Richard M. | Conservative | Cariboo—Prince George | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Harrison, Jeremy | Conservative | Desnethé—Missinippi—Churchill River | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Hearn, Hon. Loyola | Conservative | St. John's South—Mount Pearl | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Hiebert, Russ | Conservative | South Surrey—White Rock—Cloverdale | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Hill, Hon. Jay | Conservative | Prince George—Peace River | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Hinton, Betty | Conservative | Kamloops—Thompson—Cariboo | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Holland, Mark | Liberal | Ajax—Pickering | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Hubbard, Hon. Charles | Liberal | Miramichi | New Brunswick | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.