Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 19 of 19
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Galipeau, Royal | Conservative | Ottawa—Orléans | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Gallant, Cheryl | Conservative | Renfrew—Nipissing—Pembroke | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Garneau, Hon. Marc | Liberal | Westmount—Ville-Marie | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Garrison, Randall | NDP | Esquimalt—Juan de Fuca | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Genest-Jourdain, Jonathan | NDP | Manicouagan | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Genest, Réjean | NDP | Shefford | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Giguère, Alain | NDP | Marc-Aurèle-Fortin | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Gill, Parm | Conservative | Brampton—Springdale | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Glover, Hon. Shelly | Conservative | Saint Boniface | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Godin, Yvon | NDP | Acadie—Bathurst | New Brunswick | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Goguen, Robert | Conservative | Moncton—Riverview—Dieppe | New Brunswick | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Goldring, Peter | Conservative | Edmonton East | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Goodale, Hon. Ralph | Liberal | Wascana | Saskatchewan | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Goodyear, Hon. Gary | Conservative | Cambridge | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Gosal, Hon. Bal | Conservative | Bramalea—Gore—Malton | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Gourde, Jacques | Conservative | Lotbinière—Chutes-de-la-Chaudière | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Gravelle, Claude | NDP | Nickel Belt | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Grewal, Nina | Conservative | Fleetwood—Port Kells | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Groguhé, Sadia | NDP | Saint-Lambert | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.