Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 21 of 21
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gagnon, Christiane | Bloc Québécois | Québec | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Gagnon, Marcel | Bloc Québécois | Saint-Maurice—Champlain | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Gagnon, Sébastien | Bloc Québécois | Jonquière—Alma | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Gallant, Cheryl | Conservative | Renfrew—Nipissing—Pembroke | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Gallaway, Hon. Roger | Liberal | Sarnia—Lambton | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Gaudet, Roger | Bloc Québécois | Montcalm | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Gauthier, Michel | Bloc Québécois | Roberval—Lac-Saint-Jean | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Godbout, Marc | Liberal | Ottawa—Orléans | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Godfrey, Hon. John | Liberal | Don Valley West | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Godin, Yvon | NDP | Acadie—Bathurst | New Brunswick | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Goldring, Peter | Conservative | Edmonton East | Alberta | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Goodale, Hon. Ralph | Liberal | Wascana | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Goodyear, Hon. Gary | Conservative | Cambridge | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Gouk, Jim | Conservative | British Columbia Southern Interior | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Graham, Hon. Bill | Liberal | Toronto Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Grewal, Gurmant | Conservative | Newton—North Delta | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Grewal, Nina | Conservative | Fleetwood—Port Kells | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Guarnieri, Hon. Albina | Liberal | Mississauga East—Cooksville | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Guay, Monique | Bloc Québécois | Rivière-du-Nord | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Guergis, Hon. Helena | Conservative | Simcoe—Grey | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Guimond, Michel | Bloc Québécois | Montmorency—Charlevoix—Haute-Côte-Nord | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.