Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 10 of 10
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Faille, Meili | Bloc Québécois | Vaudreuil-Soulanges | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Fantino, Hon. Julian | Conservative | Vaughan | Ontario | Monday, November 29, 2010 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Fast, Hon. Ed | Conservative | Abbotsford | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Finley, Hon. Diane | Conservative | Haldimand—Norfolk | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Flaherty, Hon. Jim | Conservative | Whitby—Oshawa | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Fletcher, Hon. Steven | Conservative | Charleswood—St. James—Assiniboia | Manitoba | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Folco, Raymonde | Liberal | Laval—Les Îles | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Foote, Hon. Judy | Liberal | Random—Burin—St. George's | Newfoundland and Labrador | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Freeman, Carole | Bloc Québécois | Châteauguay—Saint-Constant | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Fry, Hon. Hedy | Liberal | Vancouver Centre | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.