Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 10 of 10
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Faille, Meili | Bloc Québécois | Vaudreuil-Soulanges | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Fast, Hon. Ed | Conservative | Abbotsford | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Finley, Hon. Diane | Conservative | Haldimand—Norfolk | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Fitzpatrick, Brian | Conservative | Prince Albert | Saskatchewan | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Flaherty, Hon. Jim | Conservative | Whitby—Oshawa | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Fletcher, Hon. Steven | Conservative | Charleswood—St. James—Assiniboia | Manitoba | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Folco, Raymonde | Liberal | Laval—Les Îles | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Fontana, Hon. Joe | Liberal | London North Centre | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Wednesday, September 20, 2006 |
Freeman, Carole | Bloc Québécois | Châteauguay—Saint-Constant | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Fry, Hon. Hedy | Liberal | Vancouver Centre | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.