Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 9 of 9
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Faille, Meili | Bloc Québécois | Vaudreuil-Soulanges | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Finley, Hon. Diane | Conservative | Haldimand—Norfolk | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Fitzpatrick, Brian | Conservative | Prince Albert | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Fletcher, Hon. Steven | Conservative | Charleswood—St. James—Assiniboia | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Folco, Raymonde | Liberal | Laval—Les Îles | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Fontana, Hon. Joe | Liberal | London North Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Forseth, Paul | Conservative | New Westminster—Coquitlam | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Frulla, Hon. Liza | Liberal | Jeanne-Le Ber | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Fry, Hon. Hedy | Liberal | Vancouver Centre | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.