Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Easter, Hon. Wayne | Liberal | Malpeque | Prince Edward Island | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Eglinski, Jim | Conservative | Yellowhead | Alberta | Monday, November 17, 2014 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Eyking, Hon. Mark | Liberal | Sydney—Victoria | Nova Scotia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.