Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Easter, Hon. Wayne | Liberal | Malpeque | Prince Edward Island | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Efford, Hon. Ruben John | Liberal | Avalon | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Emerson, Hon. David | Liberal | Vancouver Kingsway | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Epp, Ken | Conservative | Edmonton—Sherwood Park | Alberta | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Eyking, Hon. Mark | Liberal | Sydney—Victoria | Nova Scotia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.