Members of the 37th Parliament
(Monday, January 29, 2001 to Sunday, May 23, 2004)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 6 of 6
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Easter, Hon. Wayne | Liberal | Malpeque | Prince Edward Island | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Efford, Hon. Ruben John | Liberal | Bonavista—Trinity—Conception | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, May 13, 2002 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Eggleton, Hon. Art | Liberal | York Centre | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Elley, Reed | Conservative | Nanaimo—Cowichan | British Columbia | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Epp, Ken | Conservative | Elk Island | Alberta | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Eyking, Hon. Mark | Liberal | Sydney—Victoria | Nova Scotia | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.