Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Earle, Gordon | NDP | Halifax West | Nova Scotia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Easter, Hon. Wayne | Liberal | Malpeque | Prince Edward Island | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Eggleton, Hon. Art | Liberal | York Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Elley, Reed | Canadian Alliance | Nanaimo—Cowichan | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Epp, Ken | Canadian Alliance | Elk Island | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.