Members of the 37th Parliament
(Monday, January 29, 2001 to Sunday, May 23, 2004)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 17 of 17
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dalphond-Guiral, Madeleine | Bloc Québécois | Laval Centre | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Davies, Libby | NDP | Vancouver East | British Columbia | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Day, Hon. Stockwell | Conservative | Okanagan—Coquihalla | British Columbia | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Desjarlais, Bev | NDP | Churchill | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Desrochers, Odina | Bloc Québécois | Lotbinière—L'Érable | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
DeVillers, Hon. Paul | Liberal | Simcoe North | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Dhaliwal, Hon. Herb | Liberal | Vancouver South—Burnaby | British Columbia | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Dion, Hon. Stéphane | Liberal | Saint-Laurent—Cartierville | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Discepola, Nick | Liberal | Vaudreuil—Soulanges | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Doyle, Hon. Norman E. | Conservative | St. John's East | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Dromisky, Stan | Liberal | Thunder Bay—Atikokan | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Drouin, Hon. Claude | Liberal | Beauce | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Dubé, Antoine | Bloc Québécois | Lévis-et-Chutes-de-la-Chaudière | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Monday, March 17, 2003 |
Duceppe, Gilles | Bloc Québécois | Laurier—Sainte-Marie | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Duhamel, Hon. Ronald | Liberal | Saint Boniface | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Monday, January 14, 2002 |
Duncan, Hon. John | Conservative | Vancouver Island North | British Columbia | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Duplain, Claude | Liberal | Portneuf | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.